Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Eparchy of Kolomyia (Ukrainian)

Eparchia Kolomyiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vasyl Ivasyuk, Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Eparchy of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian)
20 April 1993ErectedEparchy of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian) (erected)
21 November 2011Metropolitan ChangedEparchy of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian) (from Kyiv)
12 September 2017SplitEparchy of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Chernivtsi (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Kolomyia (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Kolomyia (Ukrainian)
12 September 2017SplitEparchy of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian) Eparchy of Chernivtsi (Ukrainian)
Eparchy of Kolomyia (Ukrainian)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Eparchy of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian)
1999501,1761,450,00034.6%17831812,7683188ap2000
2000240,9601,384,50017.4%18721891,2742230ap2001
2001240,9601,384,50017.4%18621881,2812276ap2002
2002240,9001,384,50017.4%18931921,2543276ap2003
2003240,4001,384,00017.4%19631991,2083276ap2004
2004240,0001,384,00017.3%21142151,1164278ap2005
2006240,0001,384,00017.3%20532081,1532028279ap2007
2009239,3001,242,40019.3%2212211,082336279ap2010
2013238,4001,238,40019.3%246246969336281ap2014
2016237,7001,200,00019.8%2162161,1008535282ap2017
Eparchy of Kolomyia (Ukrainian)

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.4, 16 Sep 2018; Data: 1 Oct 2018

Quantcast