Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jan Martyniak

Archbishop Emeritus of Przemyśl-Warszawa {-Warsaw} (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1939 BornSpas
29 Jun 196425.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jul 198950.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Przemyśl, Sambor, et Sanok (Ukrainian), Poland
20 Jul 198950.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vardimissa
16 Sep 198950.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vardimissa
16 Jan 199151.5AppointedBishop of Przemyśl (Ruthenian), Poland
24 May 199656.9AppointedArchbishop of Przemyśl-Warszawa {-Warsaw} (Ukrainian), Poland
7 Nov 201576.3RetiredArchbishop of Przemyśl-Warszawa {-Warsaw} (Ukrainian), Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Martyniak
Archbishop Jan Martyniak (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Przemyśl-Warszawa {-Warsaw}

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Przemyśl-Warszawa {-Warsaw} (Ukrainian).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,470
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,670
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 161, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Jun 2016