Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pavlo Vasylyk

Deceased

Bishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1926Born
1 Jan 195023.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Nov 195630.2Ordained PriestPriest
1 May 197447.7Ordained BishopAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Jan 199164.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ivano-Frankivsk [Stanisławów] (Ukrainian), Ukraine
16 Jan 199164.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Plotinopolis
20 Apr 199366.6AppointedBishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine
12 Dec 200478.3DiedBishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi (Ukrainian), Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Pavlo Vasylyk
Bishop Pavlo Vasylyk (born , died ) Bishop of Kolomyia-Chernivtsi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoryslavka, Poland

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,261
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • od: CB, 4 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast