Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Acampa

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Titular Bishop of Tortibulum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1945 Born
29 Jun 196823.0Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
28 Jun 201469.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
28 Jun 201469.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tortibulum
6 Sep 201469.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tortibulum

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Acampa
Bishop Gennaro Acampa (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 1 Jul 2014
  • c34: CB, 6 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,283

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018