Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Hinder, O.F.M. Cap.

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Arabia

Titular Bishop of Macon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1942 BornLanterswil-Stehrenberg, Switzerland
18 Sep 196624.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
4 Jul 196725.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 Dec 200361.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Arabia, Yemen
12 Dec 200361.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Macon
30 Jan 200461.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macon
21 Mar 200562.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Arabia, Yemen
31 May 201169.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southern Arabia, Yemen

MicroData Summary for Paul Hinder:
Bishop Paul Hinder O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Arabia

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Arabia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 1,051, and Page 922
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,520

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013