Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucio Lemmo

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

Titular Bishop of Turres Ammeniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1946 BornNapoli
18 Apr 197326.9Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
9 Jan 201063.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
9 Jan 201063.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Turres Ammeniae
11 Feb 201063.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turres Ammeniae

MicroData Summary for Lucio Lemmo:
Bishop Lucio Lemmo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jan 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,570
  • op/c1: CB, 3 Sep 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 31 Oct 2014