Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Orazio Francesco Piazza

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1953 BornSolopaca
25 Jun 197824.7Ordained PriestPriest of Telese o Cerreto Sannita, Italy
25 Jun 201359.7AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
21 Sep 201360.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Orazio Francesco Piazza:
Bishop Orazio Francesco Piazza (born ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sessa Aurunca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 10 Jul 2013
  • c34: CB, 16 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 17 Sep 2013