Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Niccolò Orsini

Deceased

Bishop of Ripatransone


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Sep 1636AppointedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
28 Sep 1636Ordained BishopBishop of Ripatransone, Italy
18 Oct 1653DiedBishop of Ripatransone, Italy

MicroData Summary for Niccolò Orsini:
Bishop Niccolò Orsini (died ) Bishop of Ripatransone

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 296
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 97, Number 585
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015