Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Lorenzo Cardinal Brancati di Lauria, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1612BornLauria, Italy
17 May 163220.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
1 Sep 168169.4Elevated to Cardinal
22 Sep 168169.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
1 Dec 168169.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
30 Nov 169381.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Brancati di Lauria:
Cardinal Lorenzo Brancati di Lauria O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a cardinal for 12.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013