Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Gutiérrez

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578¹BornCordoba, Spain
25 Jun 164668.4SelectedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
18 May 164870.3ConfirmedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
20 Mar 164971.2DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Gutiérrez:
Bishop Juan Gutiérrez (died ) Bishop of Vigevano

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 369
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 178, Number 1,110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015