Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Gavotti, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia

Titular Archbishop of Rhodus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹BornSavona
20 Jun 163338.5AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
10 Jul 163338.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
28 Oct 164348.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
7 Jul 164651.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
27 Jan 165358.1ResignedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
2 Jul 167075.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhodus
9 Aug 167984.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Gavotti:
Archbishop Lorenzo Gavotti C.R. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ventimiglia

  • a bishop for 46.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 333
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 363
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,676

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013