Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Arcudio, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1589¹BornSoliso
19 Dec 163950.9AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
25 Dec 163950.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nusco, Italy
7 Oct 164152.7DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Arcudio:
Bishop Francesco Arcudio C.R. (died ) Bishop of Nusco

  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 263
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1639, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 15 Mar 2015