Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Borgia

Deceased

Bishop of Segni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹Born
13 Jul 164343.5AppointedBishop of Segni, Italy
26 Jul 164343.5Ordained BishopBishop of Segni, Italy
17 Jul 165555.5DiedBishop of Segni, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Borgia
Bishop Andrea Borgia (born 1600, died ) Bishop of Segni

EventPlace
Birth PlacePreneste

  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 315
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1643, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast