Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clemente Ascanio Sandri-Trotti

Deceased

Bishop of Fossano


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jul 1658AppointedBishop of Fossano, Italy
28 Jul 1658Ordained BishopBishop of Fossano, Italy
20 Apr 1675DiedBishop of Fossano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Clemente Ascanio Sandri-Trotti:
Bishop Clemente Ascanio Sandri-Trotti (died ) Bishop of Fossano

  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 120, Number 734
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 190

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013