Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Emilio Cardinal Rondinini

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617²BornRome
13 Jul 164326.5Elevated to Cardinal
31 Aug 164326.6InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
5 May 165336.3AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
25 May 165336.3Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
14 May 165538.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
6 Mar 165639.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
30 Apr 166851.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Eusebio
16 Sep 166851.7DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Emilio Rondinini:
Paolo Emilio Cardinal Rondinini (died ) Bishop of Assisi

  • a bishop for 15.3 years
  • a cardinal for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 97
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1653, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015