Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Federico Cardinal Borromeo (Jr.)

Deceased

Secretary of State

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1617BornMilan, Italy
29 Mar 164426.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Oct 165437.4AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
28 Nov 165437.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
30 Nov 165437.5Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
20 Aug 166548.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
25 Feb 166850.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
May 167052.9AppointedSecretary of State
Jul 167053.1ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
22 Dec 167053.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Feb 167153.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
8 Aug 167255.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
18 Feb 167355.7DiedSecretary of State

MicroData Summary for Federico Borromeo (Jr.):
Cardinal Federico Borromeo (Jr.) (born , died ) Secretary of State

  • a bishop for 18.2 years
  • a cardinal for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe der Deutschsprachigen Länder
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1670
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013