Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Rusnak, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1921BornBeaverdale, PA, USA
2 Aug 194220.9ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
4 Jul 194927.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
25 Aug 196443.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Toronto (Ukrainian), Canada
25 Aug 196443.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tzernicus
2 Jan 196543.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tzernicus
13 Oct 198059.1AppointedBishop of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada
11 Nov 199675.2RetiredBishop of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada
16 Jan 200381.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto (Slovakian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Michael Rusnak:
Bishop Michael Rusnak C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saints Cyril and Methodius of Toronto

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 6 Feb 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 10 Jun 2015