Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Dudick

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1916Born
13 Nov 194529.7Ordained PriestPriest of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
6 Jul 196347.3IncardinatedPriest of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
29 Jul 196852.4AppointedBishop of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
24 Oct 196852.6Ordained BishopBishop of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
6 Nov 199579.7RetiredBishop of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA
30 May 200791.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Passaic (Ruthenian), New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Dudick
Bishop Michael Joseph Dudick (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Passaic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Clair
Ordained PriestMunhall, PA

  • a priest for 61.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Feb 2018