Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emil John Mihalik

Deceased

Bishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1920Born
21 Sep 194525.6Ordained PriestPriest of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania
22 Mar 196949.1AppointedBishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA
12 Jun 196949.3Ordained BishopBishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA
27 Jan 198463.9DiedBishop of Parma (Ruthenian), Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Emil John Mihalik (VIAF: 305607021)
Bishop Emil John Mihalik (born , died ) Bishop of Parma

EventPlace
Birth PlacePittsburgh, Diocese of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania
Ordained PriestTrenton, NJ, Apostolic Exarchate of United States of America (Ruthenian), Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Feb 2018