Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedictus Estephanus Rolly Untu, M.S.C.

Bishop of Manado, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1957 Born
15 Jan 198326.0Perpetual VowsMember of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
29 Jun 198326.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
12 Apr 201760.2AppointedBishop of Manado, Indonesia
8 Jul 201760.5Ordained BishopBishop of Manado, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Benedictus Estephanus Rolly Untu
Bishop Benedictus Estephanus Rolly Untu M.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Manado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLembean, Diocese of Manado
Ordained BishopMaesa Stadium, Tondano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Manado.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2017
  • ob: CB, 21 Apr 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,481

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Sep 2017