Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodorus Hubertus Moors, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Manado


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1912BornJungelroy-Weert
13 Mar 193724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
13 Apr 196754.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manado, Indonesia
13 Apr 196754.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Choba
25 Jul 196754.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Choba
26 Jun 196956.6AppointedBishop of Manado, Indonesia
8 Feb 199077.3RetiredBishop of Manado, Indonesia
18 Mar 200390.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Manado, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Theodorus Hubertus Moors:
Bishop Theodorus Hubertus Moors M.S.C. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Manado

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 35.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013