Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Port Moresby

Archidioecesis Portus Moresbiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Ribat, M.S.C., Archbishop
  • Brian James Barnes, O.F.M., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of New Guinea
10 May 1889ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Melanesia Vicariate Apostolic of New Guinea (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Papua
14 November 1922Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of New Guinea Vicariate Apostolic of Papua
13 June 1946Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Papua Prefecture Apostolic of Samarai (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Port Moresby
13 June 1946Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Papua Vicariate Apostolic of Port Moresby
13 November 1958Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Port Moresby Prefecture Apostolic of Mendi (erected)
16 July 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Port Moresby Prefecture Apostolic of Daru (erected)
16 July 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Port Moresby Vicariate Apostolic of Yule Island (erected)
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Port Moresby
Archdiocese of Port Moresby
Archdiocese of Port Moresby
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Port Moresby
Archdiocese of Port Moresby

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Port Moresby
195025,594220,00011.6%14748533631034ap1951
Archdiocese of Port Moresby
196913,400196,0006.8%2727496525712ap1971
198032,000243,88613.1%74552615214014715ap1981
199074,000292,00025.3%2039591,25413913723ap1991
1999137,820462,76729.8%1342552,50512512323ap2000
2000158,883476,65033.3%1441552,88811512523ap2001
2001160,790482,37033.3%1239513,1529313723ap2002
2002163,201494,42933.0%958672,4356613223ap2003
2003181,529504,31736.0%1157682,6696616123ap2004
2004183,889512,38635.9%1456702,62616614519ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.8, 18 Feb 2012; data: 4 Mar 2012