Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Makassar

Archidioecesis Makassarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Johannes Liku Ada’, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 15 March 2000
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 116,252 (44,902 Square Miles)
  • Blog: http://keuskupan.blogspot.com/
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan Agung, Jl. Thamrin 5-7, Makassar 90111, Sulawesi Selatan, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0411)315.744
  • Fax: 326.674

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Makassar
13 April 1937ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Celebes Prefecture Apostolic of Makassar (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Makassar
13 May 1948ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Makassar Vicariate Apostolic of Makassar
Archdiocese of Makassar
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Makassar Archdiocese of Makassar
Archdiocese of Ujung Pandang
22 August 1973Name ChangedArchdiocese of Makassar Archdiocese of Ujung Pandang
Archdiocese of Makassar
15 March 2000Name ChangedArchdiocese of Ujung Pandang Archdiocese of Makassar

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Makassar
19507,8173,600,000.2%2828279768ap1951
Archdiocese of Makassar
197050,9086,000,000.8%5451105484711216ap1971
Archdiocese of Ujung Pandang
198082,7687,251,0001.1%1129402,069737931ap1981
1990139,0229,550,9321.5%3513482,896699035ap1991
1999167,1129,511,4361.8%6214762,198861119ap2000
Archdiocese of Makassar
2000167,36610,855,7741.5%6110712,357841089ap2001
2001181,6559,549,5031.9%677742,454881009ap2002
2002174,8479,549,5031.8%697762,300119949ap2003
2003178,0329,615,5431.9%709792,253919639ap2004
2004178,59211,519,6281.6%7110812,20411810542ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.7, 29 Jan 2012; data: 17 Feb 2012