Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Manado

Dioecesis Manadoensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 3 January 1961
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Makassar
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 90,000 (34,762 Square Miles)
  • Description: North Sulawesi, Central Sulawesi, and Gorontalo (all on Sulawesi island)
  • Mailing Address: Jl. Sam Ratulangi 66, Kotak Pos 73, Manado 95002, Sulawesi Utara, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0431)864.225; 863.420

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of CÚlebes
19 November 1919ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of CÚlebes (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of CÚlebes
1 February 1934ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of CÚlebes Vicariate Apostolic of CÚlebes
13 April 1937Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of CÚlebes (Makassar (Gouvernment van Geleites en Onderhoorigheden)) Prefecture Apostolic of Makassar (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Manado
13 April 1937Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of CÚlebes Vicariate Apostolic of Manado
Diocese of Manado
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Manado Diocese of Manado

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Manado
195032,7401,400,0002.3%3313496218843ap1951
Diocese of Manado
197066,4572,500,0002.7%447511,3036811123ap1971
198088,2303,145,0002.8%1343561,5751071296ap1981
1990122,1104,500,0002.7%2433572,1421581566ap1991
1998123,9484,332,7702.9%5636921,34718013643ap2004
2013135,8576,062,7062.2%914713898419043759ap2014
2016256,579663,01838.7%90341242,06914622064ap2017
2019145,155690,71221.0%1034614997417716467ap2020
2021141,103704,88020.0%1085115988716721572ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Vicariate Apostolic of CÚlebes
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 27, Page 67, and Page 68
  • Vicariate Apostolic of Manado
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 29, Page 331, and Page 332
  • Diocese of Manado
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 53, Page 244, to Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024