Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johannes Liku Ada’

Archbishop of Makassar, Indonesia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1948 Born
21 Jan 197526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ujung Pandang, Indonesia
11 Oct 199142.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ujung Pandang, Indonesia
11 Oct 199142.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Amantia
2 Feb 199243.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amantia
11 Nov 199445.8AppointedArchbishop of Ujung Pandang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Johannes Liku Ada’
Archbishop Johannes Liku Ada’ (born ) Archbishop of Makassar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalu Allo
Ordained BishopCour de Balai Kemununggalan Abri-Rakyat, Ujung Pandang, Archdiocese of Ujung Pandang

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Makassar.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,613

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 18 Jan 2021

Quantcast