Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Ribat, M.S.C.

Archbishop of Port Moresby


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1957 BornVolavolo
1 Dec 198528.8Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
30 Oct 200043.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea
30 Oct 200043.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Macriana Minor
11 Feb 200144.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Macriana Minor
12 Feb 200245.0AppointedBishop of Bereina, Papua New Guinea
16 Apr 200750.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea
26 Mar 200851.1SucceededArchbishop of Port Moresby, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for John Ribat:
Archbishop John Ribat M.S.C. (born ) Archbishop of Port Moresby

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Port Moresby.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2007
  • s: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,903

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013