Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Demetrius Martin Greschuk

Deceased

Bishop of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1923Born
11 Jun 195026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada
27 Jun 197450.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada
27 Jun 197450.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Nazianzus
3 Oct 197450.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nazianzus
28 Apr 198662.4AppointedBishop of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada
8 Jul 199066.6DiedBishop of Edmonton (Ukrainian), Canada

MicroData Summary for Demetrius Martin Greschuk
Bishop Demetrius Martin Greschuk (born , died ) Bishop of Edmonton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInnisfree

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • c1: CB, 12 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018