Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix-Marie-Honoré Verdet

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of La Rochelle (-Saintes)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1904BornCannes
6 Jan 193328.4Ordained PriestPriest
10 Jun 195247.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nice, France
10 Jun 195247.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Gurza
12 Jul 195247.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gurza
1 Jul 196358.9AppointedBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
17 Aug 197975.0RetiredBishop of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France
3 Jul 199287.9DiedBishop Emeritus of La Rochelle (-Saintes), France

MicroData Summary for Félix-Marie-Honoré Verdet:
Bishop Félix-Marie-Honoré Verdet (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of La Rochelle (-Saintes)

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013