Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Rezzonico

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1740BornVenice, Italy
10 Sep 177030.3Elevated to Cardinal
12 Dec 177030.5InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
21 Jul 178343.1DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Rezzonico:
Cardinal Giovanni Battista Rezzonico (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere

  • a cardinal for 12.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Sep 1770

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013