Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Colonna-Pamphili

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1725Born
22 Dec 175934.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Jan 176034.1Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 176034.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
4 Feb 176034.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
16 Feb 176034.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
Sep 1766³40.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to France
26 Sep 176640.8Elevated to Cardinal
1 Dec 176842.9InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
4 Dec 178054.9DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Colonna-Pamphili (VIAF: 89088851)
Pietro Cardinal Colonna-Pamphili (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Italy
Ordained BishopQuirinale palace, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Verona, Diocese of Verona, Italy
Buried Place (Current)patriarchal Liberian basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 20.8 years
  • a bishop for 20.8 years
  • a cardinal for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Sep 1766
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 6
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 254

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018