Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Pisani

Deceased

Bishop of Piacenza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1717Born
17 Dec 174023.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jun 176649.0AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
8 Jun 176649.0Ordained BishopBishop of Piacenza, Italy
14 Mar 178365.8DiedBishop of Piacenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Pisani
Bishop Alessandro Pisani (born , died ) Bishop of Piacenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParma

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 341
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast