Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gian Alberto De’ Grandi, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chioggia, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1689Born
6 Jan 171323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
16 Nov 175061.7AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
22 Nov 175061.7Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
21 Jul 175263.4DiedBishop of Chioggia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gian Alberto De’ Grandi
Bishop Gian Alberto De’ Grandi C.R.L. (born , died ) Bishop of Chioggia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 170
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast