Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Urbano Cardinal Paracciani Rutili

Deceased

Archbishop of Fermo

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1715BornRoma
16 Mar 173823.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Roma {Rome}, Italy
23 Mar 173823.1Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
9 Jul 176449.4AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
25 Jul 176449.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
26 Sep 176651.6Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jun 176752.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
2 Jan 177761.9DiedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Urbano Paracciani Rutili:
Urbano Cardinal Paracciani Rutili (born , died ) Archbishop of Fermo

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
  • a cardinal for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Sep 1766
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015