Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cesare Alberico Lucini

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Spain

Titular Archbishop of Nicaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1730BornMilano, Italy
13 Jan 176030.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Jan 176030.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 176030.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
16 Feb 176030.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
27 Feb 176030.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
9 Jan 176736.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Spain
14 Apr 176737.2ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
19 Feb 176838.1DiedApostolic Nuncio to Spain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Alberico Lucini
Archbishop Cesare Alberico Lucini (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Spain

  • a priest for 8.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1760, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 308
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 248

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 8 Nov 2016