Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio Lombardi

Deceased

Bishop of Crema


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1710BornVerona
Mar 1736³25.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 175140.8AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
21 Mar 175140.8Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
Dec 1781³71.5DiedBishop of Crema, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio Lombardi:
Bishop Marco Antonio Lombardi (born , died Dec 1781) Bishop of Crema

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 186
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1751, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015