Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Kryezezi (ab Alexio), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lezh {Lesh, Alessio}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1710¹BornLezh
16 Nov 175040.9AppointedBishop of Lezh {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
22 Nov 175040.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lezh {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
15 Aug 176555.6DiedBishop of Lezh {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoni Kryezezi (ab Alexio):
Bishop Antoni Kryezezi (ab Alexio) O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Lezh {Lesh, Alessio}

  • a bishop for 14.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 76
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 28 Sep 2013