Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Girolamo Gradenigo, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Udine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1708BornVenezia
20 Jan 173223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
1 Feb 176556.9SelectedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
27 Jan 176657.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Udine, Italy
2 Feb 176657.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Udine, Italy
30 Jun 178678.3DiedArchbishop of Udine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Girolamo Gradenigo: VIAF:42181547
Archbishop Giovanni Girolamo Gradenigo C.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Udine

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1775
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 428
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015