Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Angelus Giacomelli

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1695BornPistoia
24 Sep 171823.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 176671.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
5 Oct 176671.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
17 Apr 177478.5DiedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon

MicroData Summary for Michael Angelus Giacomelli:
Archbishop Michael Angelus Giacomelli (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Chalcedon

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 161
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 8 Dec 2015