Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Martial Mouly, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin

Titular Bishop of Fussala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1807BornFigeac, France
19 Oct 182720.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
2 Apr 183123.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
23 Aug 184033.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mongolia, China
23 Aug 184033.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Fussala
25 Jul 184235.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Fussala
28 Apr 184638.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Peking [Beijing], China
3 Jan 185648.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Peking [Beijing], China
30 May 185648.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China
4 Dec 186861.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Martial Mouly:
Bishop Joseph-Martial Mouly C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 200

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013