Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alphonse de Voss (Vos), C.I.C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}, China

Titular Bishop of Abdera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1840Born
19 Dec 186323.6Ordained PriestPriest
1868²27.6ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
11 Dec 188343.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}, China
11 Dec 188343.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Abdera
18 May 188444.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abdera
21 Jul 188848.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}, China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alphonse de Voss (Vos)
Bishop Alphonse de Voss (Vos) C.I.C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southwestern Mongolia {Mongolia Occiduo-Meridionale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessines, Diocese of Brugge {Bruges}, Belgium
Ordained BishopSiwantze
Death PlaceSan-tao-ho

  • a priest for 24.5 years
  • a bishop for 4.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 69
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,884, Number 26
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast