Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules Prosper París, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing], China

Titular Bishop of Silandus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1846Born
17 Oct 186620.1ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
18 Sep 188034.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
27 Apr 190053.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kiangnan, China
27 Apr 190053.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Silandus
11 Nov 190054.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Silandus
8 Aug 192174.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kiangsu, China
1 May 192275.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing], China
13 May 193184.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing], China

MicroData Summary for Jules Prosper París
Bishop Jules Prosper París S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nanking [Nanjing]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChantenay, Diocese of Nantes, France
Ordained BishopShanghai
Death PlaceShanghai

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 519
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast