Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Léon Ferrant, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale}

Titular Bishop of Barbalissus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1859BornWervicq, France
8 Dec 188021.4ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
7 Jun 188424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
27 Jun 189839.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale}, China
27 Jun 189839.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Barbalissus
2 Oct 189839.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Barbalissus
23 Sep 190546.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale}, China
5 Nov 191051.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale}, China

MicroData Summary for Paul-Léon Ferrant:
Bishop Paul-Léon Ferrant C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Kiangsi {Kiam-Si Settentrionale}

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013