Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Gabriel Delaplace, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin

Titular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1820BornAuxerre, France
9 Aug 184222.6ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
11 Jun 184323.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
27 Feb 185232.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kiam-Si {Kiangsi}, China
27 Feb 185232.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
25 Jul 185232.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hadrianopolis in Honoriade
12 Jun 185434.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Chekiang {Ce-Kiam Orientale}, China
21 Jan 187050.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China
24 May 188464.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China

MicroData Summary for Louis-Gabriel Delaplace:
Bishop Louis-Gabriel Delaplace C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • c2: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 77

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013