Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Maria Reuß (Reuss)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Sinope


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1906BornLimburg
6 Apr 193023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
19 Nov 195447.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
19 Nov 195447.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinope
21 Dec 195448.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sinope
3 Jul 197871.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
5 Jun 198578.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Joseph Maria Reuß (Reuss):
Bishop Joseph Maria Reuß (Reuss) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013