Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wolfgang Rolly

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Taborenta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1927BornDarmstadt
28 Feb 195325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
5 Jun 197244.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
5 Jun 197244.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Taborenta
2 Jul 197244.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taborenta
20 Feb 200375.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
25 Mar 200880.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang Rolly:
Bishop Wolfgang Rolly (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 23 Sep 2014