Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduard Schick

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fulda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1906BornMardorf
22 Dec 192822.8Ordained PriestPriest of Fulda, Germany
14 Apr 196256.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany
14 Apr 196256.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradi
11 May 196256.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aradi
18 Dec 197468.8AppointedBishop of Fulda, Germany
12 Jan 197568.9InstalledBishop of Fulda, Germany
1 Jul 198276.4RetiredBishop of Fulda, Germany
20 Nov 200094.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Eduard Schick:
Bishop Eduard Schick (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fulda

  • a priest for 71.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 53
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013