Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduard Jakob Wedekin

Deceased

Bishop of Hildesheim


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1796BornGroß-Düngen
24 Sep 182124.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Hildesheim, Germany
11 Nov 182124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Hildesheim, Germany
27 Nov 184952.9SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
30 Sep 185053.8ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
24 Nov 185053.9Ordained BishopBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
25 Dec 187074.0DiedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Eduard Jakob Wedekin:
Bishop Eduard Jakob Wedekin (born , died ) Bishop of Hildesheim

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 306

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013