Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Wilhelm Keppler

Deceased

Bishop of Rottenburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1852Born
2 Aug 187421.8Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
11 Nov 189846.1SelectedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
28 Nov 189846.1ConfirmedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
18 Jan 189946.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rottenburg, Germany
16 Jul 192673.8DiedBishop of Rottenburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Paul Wilhelm Keppler (VIAF: 27867475)
Bishop Paul Wilhelm Keppler (born , died ) Bishop of Rottenburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchwäbisch Gmünd
Ordained BishopCathedral, Rottenburg, Diocese of Rottenburg

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 487
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017