Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Gnädinger

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

Titular Bishop of Celerina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1905Born
16 Mar 193024.3Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
5 Nov 196055.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
5 Nov 196055.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Celerina
12 Jan 196155.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Celerina
30 Dec 198075.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
12 Mar 199589.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Karl Gnädinger
Bishop Karl Gnädinger (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Freiburg im Breisgau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBohlingen-Baden

  • a priest for 64.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast