Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Johannes Christian Roos

Deceased

Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1826BornKamp
22 Aug 185327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Limburg, Germany
19 Feb 188558.8SelectedBishop of Limburg, Germany
27 Mar 188558.9ConfirmedBishop of Limburg, Germany
17 May 188559.1Ordained BishopBishop of Limburg, Germany
2 Jun 188660.1SelectedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
27 Jul 188660.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
21 Sep 188660.4InstalledArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
22 Oct 189670.5DiedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Christian Roos:
Archbishop Johannes Christian Roos (born , died ) Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 277, and Page 343
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,159
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,212

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013